TN HB1000 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 266
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires a degree-granting postsecondary educational institution to designate a staff member to serve as a homeless-student liaison to assist homeless students who are enrolled in the institution, and to develop a plan to provide homeless students who are enrolled in the institution access to housing resources, if the institution offers housing resources. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires a degree-granting postsecondary educational institution to designate a staff member to serve as a homeless-student liaison to assist homeless students who are enrolled in the institution, and to develop a plan to provide homeless students who are enrolled in the institution access to housing resources, if the institution offers housing resources. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 266
2019-04-18HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-04-17HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019
2019-04-16HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-03HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Education for 4/3/2019
2019-03-27HouseNo Action Taken
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Education for 3/27/2019
2019-03-19HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education
2019-03-19HouseDef. to Summer Study in Higher Education Subcommittee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Education
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0763 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 266

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback