TN HB1000 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that when the administrator of the division of workers' compensation makes appointments to the medical payment committee and strives to achieve geographic balance in the appointments, the administrator shall consider appointments that include individuals from the three grand divisions of the state. - Amends TCA Title 50 and Title 56.
Title
As introduced, specifies that when the administrator of the division of workers' compensation makes appointments to the medical payment committee and strives to achieve geographic balance in the appointments, the administrator shall consider appointments that include individuals from the three grand divisions of the state. - Amends TCA Title 50 and Title 56.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1102 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1000&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1000.pdf |