TN HB0996 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits an insured to provide proof of financial responsibility by using a mobile electronic device; places certain limitations on a peace officer viewing such device. - Amends TCA Title 55 and Title 56.
Title
As introduced, permits an insured to provide proof of financial responsibility by using a mobile electronic device; places certain limitations on a peace officer viewing such device. - Amends TCA Title 55 and Title 56.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Brooks [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2013-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2013-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-07 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1012 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-06 - P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0996&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0996.pdf |