TN HB0994 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the Tennessee violence intervention program within the department's office of criminal justice programs to invest in evidence-based violence reduction initiatives. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 38, Chapter 6; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 38, Chapter 6; Title 39 and Title 40, relative to the Tennessee violence intervention program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/10/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0821 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-20 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee