TN HB0987 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Failed in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases the amount of marijuana possessed or exchanged under the offenses of simple possession or casual exchange from less than one-half ounce to less than one ounce; prohibits the inference of purpose of selling or otherwise dispensing when the substance possessed or exchanged was less than one ounce of marijuana. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, increases the amount of marijuana possessed or exchanged under the offenses of simple possession or casual exchange from less than one-half ounce to less than one ounce; prohibits the inference of purpose of selling or otherwise dispensing when the substance possessed or exchanged was less than one ounce of marijuana. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseFailed in Judiciary
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
2019-03-20HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/3/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
2019-03-13HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/20/2019
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1218 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback