TN HB0986 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Taken off notice for cal. in Consumer and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Pregnant Workers Fairness Act." - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 50.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Pregnant Workers Fairness Act." - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 50.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Consumer and Human Resources Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 3/25/2019
2019-03-19HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Employee Affairs Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-13HouseReassigned to s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee
2019-03-12HouseReturned to the Clerk's Desk.
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Employee Affairs Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
2019-02-26HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Employee Affairs Subcommittee for 2/26/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0758 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback