TN HB0978 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, creates a Class C misdemeanor offense, punishable by a $50 fine and community service work, for camping along a controlled-access highway or entrance or exit ramp; expands Equal Access to Public Property Act of 2012, under which it is a Class E felony offense for a person to camp on property owned by the state knowing that the area on which the camping occurs is not specifically designated for use as a camping area, to apply the offense of unauthorized camping to all public property. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 3 and Title 55, Chapter 8.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 14; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 3 and Title 55, Chapter 8, relative to public property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 57 N: 28 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Previous Question (Y: 14 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 62 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-06 Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
2022-05-06 Pub. Ch. 986
2022-05-03 Returned by Governor without signature.
2022-04-22HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2022-04-20SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2022-04-20HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2022-04-19HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2022-04-18HouseH. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 57, Nays 28 PNV 6 HB0978
2022-04-14HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar 4/18/22
2022-04-13SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 22, Nays 10
2022-04-13SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0892)
2022-04-13SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2021-04-15SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2021-04-14HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-04-14HousePassed H., Ayes 62, Nays 22, PNV 6
2021-04-14HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-04-08HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2021
2021-04-07HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021
2021-03-31HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-03-24HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/31/2021
2021-03-24HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2021-03-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2021
2021-02-22HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2021-02-22HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2021-02-11HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-10HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1610 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 986

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback