TN HB0972 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces, from a Class A misdemeanor to a Class C misdemeanor, the offenses of knowing possession, casual exchange, and distribution of small amounts of marijuana; establishes early release eligibility for nonviolent offenders convicted of Class A misdemeanor marijuana offenses. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41, relative to Schedule VI controlled substances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1476 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee