TN HB0969 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-13 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-13 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that an applicant shall be deemed by the Tennessee regulatory authority to have satisfied all of the requirements necessary for approval of a state-issued certificate of franchise authority if the applicant has provided fiber-to-the-premises to at least 1,000 customers for a period of at least one year prior to the application. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, specifies that an applicant shall be deemed by the Tennessee regulatory authority to have satisfied all of the requirements necessary for approval of a state-issued certificate of franchise authority if the applicant has provided fiber-to-the-premises to at least 1,000 customers for a period of at least one year prior to the application. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. Kevin Brooks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/6/2018 |
2017-03-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1057 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-13 - Failed in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee / no second