TN HB0966 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-18 - Returned to House Clerk's Desk
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-18 - Returned to House Clerk's Desk
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits electronic formats of reports on findings and recommendations concerning pilot after-school educational programs by the commissioner of education to the governor and the speakers and education committees of the senate and house. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, permits electronic formats of reports on findings and recommendations concerning pilot after-school educational programs by the commissioner of education to the governor and the speakers and education committees of the senate and house. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] | Rep. JoAnne Favors [D] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. Barbara Cooper [D] |
Rep. John Clemmons [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | House | Returned to House Clerk's Desk |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/11/2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1150 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-25 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0966&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0966.pdf |