TN HB0958 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 799
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 799
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires, in certain circumstances, the instant check unit of the TBI to contact the chief law enforcement officer of a jurisdiction where a person who has been adjudicated as a mental defective or judicially committed to a mental institution attempts to purchase a firearm; requires the reporting of certain other information of persons involuntarily committed. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 33 and Section 38-6-109.
Title
As enacted, requires, in certain circumstances, the instant check unit of the TBI to contact the chief law enforcement officer of a jurisdiction where a person who has been adjudicated as a mental defective or judicially committed to a mental institution attempts to purchase a firearm; requires the reporting of certain other information of persons involuntarily committed. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 33 and Section 38-6-109.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Farmer [R] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Martin Daniel [R] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 799 | |
2018-04-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-12 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/5/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Sponsor change. |
2018-03-07 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2018-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-01-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0834 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 799