TN HB0956 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits public utilities from requiring governmental entities to pay a deposit as a precondition for service. - Amends TCA Title 7 and Title 65.
Title
As introduced, prohibits public utilities from requiring governmental entities to pay a deposit as a precondition for service. - Amends TCA Title 7 and Title 65.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Gant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Utilities Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1254 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee