TN HB0949 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 45-22)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the Governor's Investment in Vocational Education Act; specifies that financial assistance received for all dual enrollment courses attempted after the fourth dual enrollment course reduces any subsequent award of the Tennessee HOPE scholarship. - Amends TCA Section 49-4-930.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the Governor's Investment in Vocational Education Act; specifies that financial assistance received for all dual enrollment courses attempted after the fourth dual enrollment course reduces any subsequent award of the Tennessee HOPE scholarship. - Amends TCA Section 49-4-930.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-04-04HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019
2019-04-02HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/2/2019
2019-03-27HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-03-20HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Education for 3/20/2019
2019-03-13HouseNo Action Taken
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Education for 3/13/2019
2019-03-05HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/5/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Education
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0805 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-16 - Transmitted to Governor for action.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback