TN HB0948 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 05/26/2021, 10/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Health Services and Planning Act of 2021," which revises various provisions of and renames the Tennessee Health Services and Planning Act of 2002. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to certificates of need.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 76 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-02 Effective date(s) 05/26/2021, 10/01/2021
2021-06-02 Pub. Ch. 557
2021-05-26 Signed by Governor.
2021-05-14HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-05-11HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-05-07HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-05-05SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 1
2021-05-05SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0447)
2021-05-05SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0088)
2021-05-05SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2021-05-04HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-05-04SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2021-05-04HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-05-04HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 76, Nays 13, PNV 0
2021-05-04HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA0466)
2021-05-04HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0452)
2021-05-04HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0328)
2021-05-03HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021
2021-05-03HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021
2021-05-03HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-05-03HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/3/2021
2021-05-03HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-04-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021
2021-04-28HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-04-27HousePlaced behind the budget
2021-04-21HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/28/2021
2021-04-19HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-04-14HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2021-04-14HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-04-07HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 4/14/2021
2021-04-06HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2021-03-31HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/6/2021
2021-03-30HouseAction Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 4/6/2021
2021-03-25HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/30/2021
2021-03-24HouseAssigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
2021-03-24HouseRef. to Health Committee
2021-03-23HouseSponsor(s) withdrawn.
2021-03-23HouseSponsor change.
2021-02-22HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2021-02-11HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-10HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1281 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 557

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback