TN HB0948 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 459
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 459
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, abolishes the division of consumer affairs in the department of commerce and insurance and transfers the responsibilities of the division concerning the consumer protection laws to the attorney general and reporter; authorizes a court to order the parties to engage in pre-trial mediation in the course of any action brought in the name of the state pursuant to the Consumer Protection Act; authorizes the division of consumer affairs in the office of the attorney general and reporter to facilitate communication between a complainant and person identified in a complaint in an effort to encourage mutually agreeable resolutions. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 47, Chapter 18; Title 47, Chapter 23 and Title 63.
Title
As enacted, abolishes the division of consumer affairs in the department of commerce and insurance and transfers the responsibilities of the division concerning the consumer protection laws to the attorney general and reporter; authorizes a court to order the parties to engage in pre-trial mediation in the course of any action brought in the name of the state pursuant to the Consumer Protection Act; authorizes the division of consumer affairs in the office of the attorney general and reporter to facilitate communication between a complainant and person identified in a complaint in an effort to encourage mutually agreeable resolutions. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 47, Chapter 18; Title 47, Chapter 23 and Title 63.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. Clark Boyd [R] |
Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 459 | |
2019-05-29 | Effective date(s) 09/30/2019 | |
2019-05-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-15 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-07 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0242) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-04 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-04 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-04 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0142) |
2019-03-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2019 |
2019-03-25 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 3/25/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Consumer Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0804 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 459