TN HB0947 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-3)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 154
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires, instead of authorizes, the Tennessee school safety center to establish school safety grants to assist LEAs in funding programs that address school safety; revises other various provisions regarding school safety grants. - Amends TCA Section 49-1-1004 and Section 49-6-4302.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires, instead of authorizes, the Tennessee school safety center to establish school safety grants to assist LEAs in funding programs that address school safety; revises other various provisions regarding school safety grants. - Amends TCA Section 49-1-1004 and Section 49-6-4302.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 154
2019-04-04HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-03-28HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2019
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2019
2019-03-26HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/26/2019
2019-03-20HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
2019-03-14HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-03-13HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Education for 3/13/2019
2019-03-06HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/6/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Education
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0803 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 154

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback