TN HB0946 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 325
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises provisions governing registration of certain motor vehicles that are registered by a business that registers at least 15,000 vehicles annually and is engaged in the rental of motor vehicles, trucks, and trailers for periods of 31 days or less. - Amends TCA Section 55-4-104.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises provisions governing registration of certain motor vehicles that are registered by a business that registers at least 15,000 vehicles annually and is engaged in the rental of motor vehicles, trucks, and trailers for periods of 31 days or less. - Amends TCA Section 55-4-104.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 325
2017-05-01HouseComp. SB subst.
2017-04-27HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/1/2017
2017-04-26HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/27/2017
2017-04-18HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2017-04-12HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/18/2017
2017-04-11HouseAction def. in Transportation Committee to 4/18/2017
2017-04-05HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/11/2017
2017-04-04HouseAction def. in Transportation Committee to 4/11/2017
2017-03-29HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/4/2017
2017-03-29HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
2017-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
2017-02-13HouseP2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
2017-02-09HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-02-08HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0162 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 325

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback