TN HB0946 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 489
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 489
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the Tennessee STEM innovation network to establish STEM innovation hubs in rural areas of the state and in Northwest Tennessee; requires the Tennessee STEM innovation network to provide a middle school curriculum on the variety and benefits of STEM careers. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, requires the Tennessee STEM innovation network to establish STEM innovation hubs in rural areas of the state and in Northwest Tennessee; requires the Tennessee STEM innovation network to provide a middle school curriculum on the variety and benefits of STEM careers. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. Harry Brooks [R] | Rep. Jimmy Eldridge [R] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Rep. Dennis Powers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 489 | |
2015-04-22 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-04-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 3/10/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/4/2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0453 (Crossfiled) 2015-06-02 - Pub. Ch. 489
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0946&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0946.pdf |