TN HB0946 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 685
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises membership of board of directors and other provisions related to sports hall of fame. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 54.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises membership of board of directors and other provisions related to sports hall of fame. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 54.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-22HouseComp. became Pub. Ch. 685
2014-03-24HouseComp. SB subst.
2014-03-20HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/24/2014
2014-03-19HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/20/2014
2014-03-18HouseRec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
2014-03-12HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/18/2014
2014-03-12HouseRec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2014-03-05HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/12/2014
2014-01-22HouseSponsor change.
2013-04-18HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/18/2013
2013-04-18HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2013
2013-04-10HousePlaced Behind the Budget
2013-04-09HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2013
2013-04-04HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2013-03-19HouseRec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2013-03-13HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 3/19/2013
2013-03-13HouseRec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
2013-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/13/2013
2013-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
2013-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2013-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2013-02-05HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0822 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-22 - Pub. Ch. 685

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback