TN HB0946 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Commerce Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates pilot project in Shelby County requiring a seller of scrap jewelry or precious metals to give thumbprint on purchaser's transaction log. - Amends TCA Section 38-1-203.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates pilot project in Shelby County requiring a seller of scrap jewelry or precious metals to give thumbprint on purchaser's transaction log. - Amends TCA Section 38-1-203.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-06 Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Commerce Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
2011-03-30 Placed on s/c cal Commerce Subcommittee for 4/6/2011
2011-03-23 Action Def. in s/c Commerce Subcommittee to 4/6/2011
2011-03-16 Placed on s/c cal Commerce Subcommittee for 3/23/2011
2011-03-02 Assigned to s/c Commerce Sub-committee
2011-02-17 P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee
2011-02-16 Intro., P1C.
2011-02-15 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0808 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-13 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Comm.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback