TN HB0945 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, from 90 days to 95 days, the time from the mailing date or in-person delivery of a monetary determination for benefits to a claimant that the claimant has to protest the monetary determination. - Amends TCA Title 50.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 50, relative to the unemployment trust fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1575 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee