TN HB0944 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 544
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the Contract Accountability and Responsible Employment (CARE) Act." - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 9 and Title 12.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts the Contract Accountability and Responsible Employment (CARE) Act." - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 9 and Title 12.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 544
2018-02-26HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-26HouseComp. SB subst.
2018-02-22HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/26/2018
2018-02-21HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/22/2018
2018-02-20HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-02-14HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 2/20/2018
2018-02-14HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-02-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/14/2018
2018-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2018-02-06HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-01-31HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 2/6/2018
2018-01-31HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
2018-01-24HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 1/31/2018
2018-01-24HouseAction Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 1/31/2018
2018-01-17HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 1/24/2018
2018-01-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2018-01-10HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 1/17/2018
2017-04-13HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-12HouseDef. to Summer Study in State Government Subcommittee
2017-04-06HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-05HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/12/2017
2017-04-05HouseAction Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 4/12/2017
2017-03-29HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/5/2017
2017-03-29HouseAction Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 4/5/2017
2017-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
2017-03-22HouseAction Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/29/2017
2017-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
2017-03-08HouseAction Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/22/2017
2017-03-01HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/8/2017
2017-02-15HouseSponsor(s) withdrawn.
2017-02-15HouseSponsor change.
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
2017-02-13HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2017-02-09HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-02-08HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1047 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-13 - Pub. Ch. 544

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback