TN HB0941 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Annual Coverage Assessment Act of 2015." - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5 and Chapter 877 of the Public Acts of 2014.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Annual Coverage Assessment Act of 2015." - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5 and Chapter 877 of the Public Acts of 2014.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0941&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0941.pdf |