TN HB0937 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires a county election commission purchasing or entering into a contract to obtain a voting system to ensure that the system produces a voter-verifiable paper audit trail. - Amends TCA Title 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, relative to voting machines.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14HouseFailed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
2021-04-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 4/14/2021
2021-02-22HouseAssigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
2021-02-22HouseP2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
2021-02-11HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-10HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0927 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback