TN HB0937 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 216
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 216
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Revised Uniform Athlete Agents Act of 2015." - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Revised Uniform Athlete Agents Act of 2015." - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 216 | |
2017-04-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-17 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-04-13 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-02-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0565 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 216