TN HB0937 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each department and agency of this state to develop an annual report detailing all federal funds received by, or passed through, the department or agency and to submit the report to each member of the general assembly by January 1 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 4.
Title
As introduced, requires each department and agency of this state to develop an annual report detailing all federal funds received by, or passed through, the department or agency and to submit the report to each member of the general assembly by January 1 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/18/2015 |
2015-02-23 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0825 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0937&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0937.pdf |