TN HB0937 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-25 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-25 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows public defender in each respective judicial district to incrementally reduce salaries of all employees within the public defender’s office as may be required to balance the district’s budget for that fiscal year instead of reducing the number of employees. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14 and Section 40-14-210.
Title
As introduced, allows public defender in each respective judicial district to incrementally reduce salaries of all employees within the public defender’s office as may be required to balance the district’s budget for that fiscal year instead of reducing the number of employees. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14 and Section 40-14-210.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-25 | Withdrawn. | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1334 (Crossfiled) 2009-03-05 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0937&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0937.pdf |