TN HB0930 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Rural Broadband Grant Expansion Program." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 65 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Rural Broadband Grant Expansion Program." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 65 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Rudd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0126 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee