TN HB0928 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, expands the exemption from an assessment to advance or renew a teaching license to include a public school teacher who, at the time of the application of an initial license, possessed an active teaching license in another state and has taught for more than 10 years. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 5, relative to educator licensure.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-28HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
2023-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/28/2023
2023-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/21/2023
2023-03-14HouseAction Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/21/2023
2023-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/14/2023
2023-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
2023-02-02HouseP2C, ref. to Education Administration
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0892 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback