TN HB0927 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Failed in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Failed in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires any person, on or after July 1, 2015, repairing or replacing a roof system, the total cost of which is between $3,000–$25,000, to be licensed as a home improvement contractor before providing the services; provided, that the person is not otherwise licensed as a contractor authorized to provide roofing services. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, requires any person, on or after July 1, 2015, repairing or replacing a roof system, the total cost of which is between $3,000–$25,000, to be licensed as a home improvement contractor before providing the services; provided, that the person is not otherwise licensed as a contractor authorized to provide roofing services. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | House | Failed in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/23/2016 |
2015-03-24 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-17 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/17/2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0901 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0927&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0927.pdf |