TN HB0925 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/04/2021; 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/04/2021; 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds certain cyber security-related information to the information that the state-level safety team must include in the template safety plan that LEAs must adopt as part of their comprehensive district-wide and building-level school safety plans. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to cyber security.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 05/04/2021; 07/01/2021 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 335 | |
2021-05-04 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-04-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0223) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-13 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-12 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-12 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0202) |
2021-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Action def. in Education Administration to 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Action def. in Education Administration to 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2021-02-25 | House | Sponsor change. |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1425 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 335