TN HB0925 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/19/2019
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Hearing: Mar 19 @ 3:00 pm in House Hearing Room I
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, relieves the commissioner of labor and workforce development of responsibilities concerning mine rescue operations; deletes statutes establishing the mine rescue corps within the department of labor and workforce development. - Amends TCA Title 59, Chapter 12.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, relieves the commissioner of labor and workforce development of responsibilities concerning mine rescue operations; deletes statutes establishing the mine rescue corps within the department of labor and workforce development. - Amends TCA Title 59, Chapter 12.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-13HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
2019-03-06HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-03-06HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-02-27HousePlaced on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/6/2019
2019-02-26HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/26/2019
2019-02-19HouseMeeting Adjourned
2019-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/19/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0781 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-12 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/19/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback