TN HB0921 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department, in consultation with the commission, to promulgate rules regarding reports to be made, records to be kept, and other matters pertaining to the collection of the wholesale beer tax. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, relative to alcohol.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2021-03-03 | House | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0712 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee