TN HB0921 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires a maximum caseload of 20 for case managers; creates a maximum caseload of 10 for foster care case managers; requires the department to comply with the maximum caseload ratios. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires a maximum caseload of 20 for case managers; creates a maximum caseload of 10 for foster care case managers; requires the department to comply with the maximum caseload ratios. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 5.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0616 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback