TN HB0921 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 390
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, prohibits the placement of a priority school in the achievement school district if, after the school is identified as a priority school, but before the commissioner determines that the school should be assigned to the achievement school district the school demonstrates student achievement growth at a level of "above expectations" or greater, as represented by TVAAS. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, prohibits the placement of a priority school in the achievement school district if, after the school is identified as a priority school, but before the commissioner determines that the school should be assigned to the achievement school district the school demonstrates student achievement growth at a level of "above expectations" or greater, as represented by TVAAS. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-18 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 390
2015-04-20HouseComp. SB subst.
2015-04-20HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-04-17HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2015
2015-04-15HouseReset on cal. for 4/20/15
2015-04-15HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2015
2015-04-15HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2015
2015-04-14HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2015-04-08HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/14/2015
2015-04-08HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2015-04-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2015
2015-04-01HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2015-03-31HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2015-03-25HousePlaced on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/31/2015
2015-03-24HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
2015-03-18HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/24/2015
2015-03-17HouseAction Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/24/2015
2015-03-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/17/2015
2015-02-25HouseAssigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
2015-02-23HouseP2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning
2015-02-18HouseP1C.
2015-02-12HouseIntro.
2015-02-11HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0758 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 390

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback