TN HB0920 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Effective date(s) 02/28/2022, 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Effective date(s) 02/28/2022, 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds cerumen management in the course of examining ears by certain persons in the definition of the practice of dispensing and fitting hearing instruments; imposes certain requirements in regard to cerumen management. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 17.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 63, Chapter 17, relative to hearing instruments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Effective date(s) 02/28/2022, 07/01/2022 | |
2022-03-07 | Pub. Ch. 622 | |
2022-02-28 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-02-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-02-14 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-02-10 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-02-10 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 94, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB0920 |
2022-02-07 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 2/10/22 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0473) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-29 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2021-04-29 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0395) |
2021-04-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/29/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Health Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0665 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 622