TN HB0918 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Pub. Ch. 168
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Pub. Ch. 168
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the segment of State Route 169 in Knox County that is a scenic highway. - Amends TCA Title 54, Chapter 17, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, revises the segment of State Route 169 in Knox County that is a scenic highway. - Amends TCA Title 54, Chapter 17, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Pub. Ch. 168 | |
2015-04-27 | Effective date(s) 04/16/2015 | |
2015-04-16 | Signed by Governor. | |
2015-04-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-03-31 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-03-24 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-03-23 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2015-03-19 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/23/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/19/2015 |
2015-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/10/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/4/2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0771 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-27 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 168