TN HB0916 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Def. to Summer Study in Education Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the board to promulgate rules to allow a public school system to meet the 180 days of classroom instruction required for each school term by providing a minimum number of instructional hours per school year. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-3004.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the board to promulgate rules to allow a public school system to meet the 180 days of classroom instruction required for each school term by providing a minimum number of instructional hours per school year. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-3004.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseDef. to Summer Study in Education Administration Subcommittee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Administration Subcommittee for 4/2/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Education Administration Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Education-- Government Operations for Review
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1285 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback