TN HB0915 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the department to file a petition to terminate the parental rights of a parent if the parent has not substantially complied with the statement of responsibilities in the child's permanency plan and the period of time originally established in the child's permanency plan has elapsed. - Amends TCA Title 36 and Title 37.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36 and Title 37, relative to children.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee
2023-02-02HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1103 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback