TN HB0914 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, changes the due date for municipal solid waste regions to submit their annual progress reports to the commissioner of environment and conservation from March 31 to April 1. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, changes the due date for municipal solid waste regions to submit their annual progress reports to the commissioner of environment and conservation from March 31 to April 1. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 68.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-13HouseAssigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
2019-03-13HouseRef. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1367 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback