TN HB0913 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 480
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 480
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows for sales or use taxes collected from a customer by a dealer being refunded to the customer if the customer twice requested a refund from the dealer and the dealer failed or declined to issue the refund and other criteria are met. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, relative to tax refunds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 480 | |
2021-04-28 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-22 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/22/2021 |
2021-04-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-09 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0883 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-21 - Effective date(s) 10/01/2021