TN HB0913 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the register of deeds to send written notice to the property owner prior to recording a lien. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 13; Title 25, Chapter 5 and Title 66.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the register of deeds to send written notice to the property owner prior to recording a lien. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 13; Title 25, Chapter 5 and Title 66.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Business Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
2019-02-12HouseAssigned to s/c Business Subcommittee
2019-02-12HouseReassigned to Commerce Committee
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0231 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback