TN HB0913 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires local governments to report, no later than February 1, 2018, to the general assembly the number of business licenses issued to places of accommodation for transients for calendar year 2017. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, requires local governments to report, no later than February 1, 2018, to the general assembly the number of business licenses issued to places of accommodation for transients for calendar year 2017. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13; Title 67 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-04-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to Next Calendar |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2017-04-11 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 2018 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0891 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-24 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.