TN HB0911 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, provides notice and a reasonable time period in which a candidate who has been determined by the executive committee of a political party to be unqualified may respond to such determination before removal of the candidate's name from the ballot. - Amends TCA Section 2-5-204.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, provides notice and a reasonable time period in which a candidate who has been determined by the executive committee of a political party to be unqualified may respond to such determination before removal of the candidate's name from the ballot. - Amends TCA Section 2-5-204.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-17HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-17HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1
2019-04-17HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0282)
2019-04-11HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2019
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019
2019-04-03HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Local Committee for 4/3/2019
2019-03-27HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Local Committee
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1354 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback