TN HB0906 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from 90 to 180 days the period by which a nonprofit public benefit corproration that partners with the Governor's Books from Birth Fund must report to the governor and the speakers of the senate and house of representatives on its operations and accomplishments after the end of the fiscal year of the nonprofit corporation. - Amends TCA Title 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, relative to state government.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1423 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee