TN HB0904 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 586
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 586
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes district attorney general to petition court for protective order prohibiting defendant and defendant's counsel from publishing certain information in certain circumstances; penalizes violation of such an order as Class E felony. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 40, relative to criminal law.
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Doggett [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] |
Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 586 | |
2021-05-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-05-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0283 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021