TN HB0903 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, corrects error in code to clarify that a petitioner is required to pay $180 upon filing a petition for expunction, rather than $350; revises fee to be $180 instead of $350 for a defendant applying for expunction of an offense following the completion of a diversion program. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 32 and Title 40, Chapter 35.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, corrects error in code to clarify that a petitioner is required to pay $180 upon filing a petition for expunction, rather than $350; revises fee to be $180 instead of $350 for a defendant applying for expunction of an offense following the completion of a diversion program. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 32 and Title 40, Chapter 35.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseReturned to the Clerk's Desk.
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
2019-03-13HouseReset on Final cal. of Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
2019-03-13HouseAction Def. in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee to 3/13/2019
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0297 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback