TN HB0903 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - Failed in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - Failed in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Pay Equality Act." - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 50.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Pay Equality Act." - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 50.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-25 - House - CONSUMER AND HUMAN RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Failed in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | Failed in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee--Governmant Operations for review |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0864 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee