TN HB0901 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 149
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 149
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes the enhanced maximum fine of up to $15,000 applicable to aggravated assault when committed against an identifiable employee or contractor of a utility who is discharging or attempting to discharge such person's official duties. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1 and Title 65, Chapter 35.
Title
As enacted, makes the enhanced maximum fine of up to $15,000 applicable to aggravated assault when committed against an identifiable employee or contractor of a utility who is discharging or attempting to discharge such person's official duties. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1 and Title 65, Chapter 35.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - HOUSE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 149 | |
2019-04-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-03-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0481 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 149