TN HB0899 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits certain health benefit plans that provide coverage for cancer therapy from holding proton radiation therapy to a higher standard of clinical evidence for medical policy benefit coverage decisions than the health plan requires for coverage of any other radiation therapy treatment. - Amends TCA Title 56.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits certain health benefit plans that provide coverage for cancer therapy from holding proton radiation therapy to a higher standard of clinical evidence for medical policy benefit coverage decisions than the health plan requires for coverage of any other radiation therapy treatment. - Amends TCA Title 56.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-01-31HouseSponsor change.
2018-01-17HouseSponsor change.
2017-04-05HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee
2017-03-29HousePlaced on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 4/5/2017
2017-03-28HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-15HouseReset on Final cal. of Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
2017-03-09HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/15/2017
2017-03-02HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-28HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-21HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
2017-02-14HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-13HouseP2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
2017-02-09HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-02-08HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0758 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-04 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback